|
10/12/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 808, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 3031.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 2462.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 19. Page 1481.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|