Assembly | 06/04/2019 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2019 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2019 | Read first time. To print. |