|
10/03/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 494, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3582.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2930.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2745.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 10)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1476.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|