Assembly | 02/03/2020 | Died on third reading file. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2020 | From inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2019 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Holden. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2019 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 16). | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2019 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/26/2019 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and E.S. & T.M. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2019 | Read first time. To print. |