California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB76 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2018

Enrolled

Bill June 16, 2020

Chaptered

Bill June 26, 2020

Amended

Bill June 10, 2020
Bill June 11, 2019