California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB761 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2019

Amended

Bill August 26, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019
Bill March 12, 2019