California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB774 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill July 9, 2019
Bill June 26, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019