Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 2065.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|