Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
Died on unfinished business file, reconsideration pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Levine.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 24. Page 3913.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|