Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1760.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2019
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|