California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB794 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/20/2019

                            CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 794Introduced by Assembly Member TingFebruary 20, 2019 An act to add and repeal Section 14542 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 794, as introduced, Ting. Beverage container recycling: report to the Legislature.The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act, which is administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, is established to promote beverage container recycling and provides for the payment, collection, and distribution of certain payments and fees based on minimum refund values established for beverage containers. This bill would require the department to conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO Bill TextThe people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 14542 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read:14542. (a) The department shall conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.(b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.(2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2025. 

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Bill No. 794Introduced by Assembly Member TingFebruary 20, 2019 An act to add and repeal Section 14542 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTAB 794, as introduced, Ting. Beverage container recycling: report to the Legislature.The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act, which is administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, is established to promote beverage container recycling and provides for the payment, collection, and distribution of certain payments and fees based on minimum refund values established for beverage containers. This bill would require the department to conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.Digest Key Vote: MAJORITY  Appropriation: NO  Fiscal Committee: YES  Local Program: NO 





 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Bill No. 794

Introduced by Assembly Member TingFebruary 20, 2019

Introduced by Assembly Member Ting
February 20, 2019

 An act to add and repeal Section 14542 of the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling. 

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

AB 794, as introduced, Ting. Beverage container recycling: report to the Legislature.

The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act, which is administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, is established to promote beverage container recycling and provides for the payment, collection, and distribution of certain payments and fees based on minimum refund values established for beverage containers. This bill would require the department to conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.

The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act, which is administered by the Department of Resources Recycling and Recovery, is established to promote beverage container recycling and provides for the payment, collection, and distribution of certain payments and fees based on minimum refund values established for beverage containers. 

This bill would require the department to conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:SECTION 1. Section 14542 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read:14542. (a) The department shall conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.(b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.(2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2025. 

The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

## The people of the State of California do enact as follows:

SECTION 1. Section 14542 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read:14542. (a) The department shall conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.(b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.(2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2025. 

SECTION 1. Section 14542 is added to the Public Resources Code, to read:

### SECTION 1.

14542. (a) The department shall conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.(b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.(2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2025. 

14542. (a) The department shall conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.(b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.(2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2025. 

14542. (a) The department shall conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.(b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.(2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2025. 



14542. (a) The department shall conduct a study on the changes to the international recycling market since January 1, 2018, and provide, by January 1, 2021, recommendations to the Legislature on how to foster more recycling of beverage container materials within the state.

(b) (1) A report submitted pursuant to subdivision (a) shall be submitted in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code.

(2) Pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code, this section is repealed on January 1, 2025.