California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB795 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2019

Amended

Bill June 27, 2019
Bill June 11, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019