California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB798 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Amended

Bill March 19, 2020
Bill June 13, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019