|
09/28/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 194, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5479.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5456.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/21/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2038.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|