California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB845 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2019

Chaptered

Bill September 4, 2019

Amended

Bill April 1, 2019
Bill March 14, 2019