California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB849 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2019

Amended

Bill September 4, 2019
Bill August 30, 2019
Bill July 3, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019
Bill March 14, 2019