Assembly
|
02/03/2020
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2020
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2020
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2020
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
In committee: Hearing for testimony only.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|