|
07/01/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 45, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1678.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2019
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1189.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|