Assembly | 02/03/2020 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2020 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2019 | In committee: Hearing for testimony only. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2019 | Read first time. To print. |