|
10/11/2019
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2019.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2019
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2019
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3486.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2019
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2859.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2019
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2019
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1590.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|