Senate
|
07/01/2019
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 1575.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2019
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2019
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|