|
09/24/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 121, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2020
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2020
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5429.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2020
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2020
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2020
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 13)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2020
|
From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1361.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2019
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|