California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB901 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2020

Amended

Bill August 13, 2020
Bill September 6, 2019
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill June 20, 2019
Bill May 16, 2019