Senate | 08/05/2020 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/23/2020 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3941.) | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 23). | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2020 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2020 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2019 | Read first time. To print. |