California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB912 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 2, 2019

Amended

Bill August 14, 2019
Bill June 26, 2019
Bill June 18, 2019
Bill May 6, 2019