Senate
|
08/30/2019
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2019
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2019
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2019
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2073.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2019
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2019
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2019
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/26/2019
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2019
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|