California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB929 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill July 2, 2019
Bill June 20, 2019
Bill June 11, 2019