California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB931 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2019

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2019

Amended

Bill August 30, 2019
Bill August 13, 2019
Bill June 24, 2019
Bill May 17, 2019
Bill April 22, 2019