Senate | 06/26/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 12). | ||
Senate | 06/10/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2019 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2019 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1175.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2019 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 12/04/2018 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. | ||
Assembly | 12/03/2018 | Read first time. To print. |