California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB992 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 18, 2020

Amended

Bill July 31, 2020
Bill April 22, 2019