LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB997
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB997
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB997
Action History
Assembly
06/04/2019
From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Assembly
03/26/2019
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
Assembly
03/07/2019
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Assembly
02/22/2019
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
Assembly
02/21/2019
Read first time. To print.