LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2019-2020 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA10
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA10
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2019-2020 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA10
Action History
Assembly
05/12/2020
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
Assembly
05/11/2020
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
06/06/2019
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR.
Assembly
02/22/2019
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
Assembly
02/21/2019
Read first time. To print.