Senate | 06/15/2020 | Measure version as amended on June 4 corrected. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2020 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2020 | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 4765.) | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2020 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2020 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 3). | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4599.) | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Art. IV, Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | Introduced measure version corrected. | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2020 | From printer. May be heard in committee June 21. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2020 | Read first time. To print. |