Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 24, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2020
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3816.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2020
|
Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 3799.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2020
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2019
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2019
|
Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 54. Noes 19. Page 3050.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/10/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (July 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2019
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2019
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2019
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2019
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2019
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2019
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|