Senate | 09/04/2019 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2019 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Read third time. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2841.) | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2019 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14). | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2019 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2019 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2019 | Read first time. To print. |