Assembly | 08/27/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.) | ||
Senate | 08/19/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 07/11/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/11/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2626.) | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2019 | Introduced. To print. |