Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2716.) | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 09/04/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/23/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2815.) | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 15). | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2019 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/12/2019 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 07/08/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2019 | Introduced. To print. |