California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR122 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 122 CHAPTER 149 Relative to Diaper Need Awareness Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 11, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 122, Gonzalez. Diaper Need Awareness Week.This measure would proclaim the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourage California citizens to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need.Digan; andWHEREAS, California has a vested interest in the health and economic mobility of low- and moderate-income families, and therefore in reducing diaper need; and WHEREAS, California is proud to be home to several strong nonprofit organizations working at the state and local levels to provide diapers to families in need; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourages Californians to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled September 09, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 122Introduced by Assembly Member Gonzalez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Gloria, Kamlager-Dove, Lackey, Mathis, Mullin, Weber, Boerner Horvath, and Cristina Garcia)(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Wilk, and Mitchell)August 12, 2019 Relative to Diaper Need Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 122, Gonzalez. Diaper Need Awareness Week.This measure would proclaim the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourage California citizens to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Diaper need occurs when a family does not have a sufficient supply of clean diapers to ensure that infants and toddlers are clean and healthy, and can adversely affect the health and well-being of young children and their families; and WHEREAS, One in three families experiences diaper need at some time while their children are less than three years of age, and nearly one-half of families delay changing a diaper to extend their supply; and WHEREAS, The average child requires at least 50 diaper changes per week over three years, making diapers a necessary supply; and WHEREAS, Diaper need creates a barrier to childcare due to the common requirement that a daily supply of diapers be provided by the childs parent or guardian; andWHEREAS, California has a vested interest in the health and economic mobility of low- and moderate-income families, and therefore in reducing diaper need; and WHEREAS, California is proud to be home to several strong nonprofit organizations working at the state and local levels to provide diapers to families in need; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourages Californians to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 122 CHAPTER 149 Relative to Diaper Need Awareness Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 11, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 122, Gonzalez. Diaper Need Awareness Week.This measure would proclaim the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourage California citizens to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need.Digan; and
3+ Enrolled September 09, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 122Introduced by Assembly Member Gonzalez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Gloria, Kamlager-Dove, Lackey, Mathis, Mullin, Weber, Boerner Horvath, and Cristina Garcia)(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Wilk, and Mitchell)August 12, 2019 Relative to Diaper Need Awareness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 122, Gonzalez. Diaper Need Awareness Week.This measure would proclaim the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourage California citizens to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
44
5- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 122 CHAPTER 149
5+ Enrolled September 09, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019
66
7- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 122
7+Enrolled September 09, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate September 05, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019
810
9- CHAPTER 149
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Assembly Concurrent Resolution
14+
15+No. 122
16+
17+Introduced by Assembly Member Gonzalez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Gloria, Kamlager-Dove, Lackey, Mathis, Mullin, Weber, Boerner Horvath, and Cristina Garcia)(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Wilk, and Mitchell)August 12, 2019
18+
19+Introduced by Assembly Member Gonzalez(Coauthors: Assembly Members Burke, Calderon, Cervantes, Gloria, Kamlager-Dove, Lackey, Mathis, Mullin, Weber, Boerner Horvath, and Cristina Garcia)(Coauthors: Senators Dodd, Galgiani, Lena Gonzalez, Wilk, and Mitchell)
20+August 12, 2019
1021
1122 Relative to Diaper Need Awareness Week.
12-
13- [ Filed with Secretary of State September 11, 2019. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 ACR 122, Gonzalez. Diaper Need Awareness Week.
2029
2130 This measure would proclaim the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourage California citizens to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need.
2231
2332 This measure would proclaim the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourage California citizens to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need.
2433
25-## Digan; and
34+## Digest Key
35+
36+## Bill Text
37+
38+WHEREAS, Diaper need occurs when a family does not have a sufficient supply of clean diapers to ensure that infants and toddlers are clean and healthy, and can adversely affect the health and well-being of young children and their families; and
39+
40+WHEREAS, One in three families experiences diaper need at some time while their children are less than three years of age, and nearly one-half of families delay changing a diaper to extend their supply; and
41+
42+WHEREAS, The average child requires at least 50 diaper changes per week over three years, making diapers a necessary supply; and
43+
44+WHEREAS, Diaper need creates a barrier to childcare due to the common requirement that a daily supply of diapers be provided by the childs parent or guardian; and
2645
2746 WHEREAS, California has a vested interest in the health and economic mobility of low- and moderate-income families, and therefore in reducing diaper need; and
2847
2948 WHEREAS, California is proud to be home to several strong nonprofit organizations working at the state and local levels to provide diapers to families in need; now, therefore, be it
3049
3150 Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature proclaims the week of September 23, 2019, to September 29, 2019, as Diaper Need Awareness Week and encourages Californians to support organizations that help alleviate diaper need; and be it further
3251
3352 Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.