California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR128 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2020

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2020

Amended

Bill August 25, 2020
Bill July 29, 2020
Bill September 5, 2019