Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2019. | ||
Assembly | 09/26/2019 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2019 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/09/2019 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2703.) | ||
Senate | 09/04/2019 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/03/2019 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2019 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2887.) | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2019 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 26). | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2019 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2019 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2019 | Introduced. To print. |