California 2019-2020 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR131 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131 CHAPTER 177 Relative to the Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 26, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Petrie-Norris. PACE Month.This measure would recognize September 2019 as PACE Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE) addresses the needs of the frail elderly and disabled adults 55 years of age and older, a population that is growing rapidly and whose impact on health care costs is significant; andWHEREAS, PACE is a fully integrated model of care that provides comprehensive, highly coordinated care allowing frail older adults who meet state eligibility criteria for nursing home level of care to continue living in the community; andWHEREAS, Individuals enrolled in PACE receive all Medicare and Medi-Cal covered items and services and additional support, which promotes well-being and greater independence; andWHEREAS, PACE assumes full financial risk for all care and medical services, including transportation, hospitalization, and long-term care, in return for capitated payments from Medicare and Medi-Cal; andWHEREAS, On Lok, Californias first PACE program, opened in 1983. There are now 12 PACE programs operating in 47 sites, serving more than 8,000 participants; andWHEREAS, The California PACE Association, known as CalPACE, formed in 2003 to support the development, expansion, success, and quality of PACE throughout California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes September 2019 as PACE Month in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
1+Enrolled September 13, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 09, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131Introduced by Assembly Member Petrie-NorrisAugust 19, 2019 Relative to the Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Petrie-Norris. PACE Month.This measure would recognize September 2019 as PACE Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, The Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE) addresses the needs of the frail elderly and disabled adults 55 years of age and older, a population that is growing rapidly and whose impact on health care costs is significant; andWHEREAS, PACE is a fully integrated model of care that provides comprehensive, highly coordinated care allowing frail older adults who meet state eligibility criteria for nursing home level of care to continue living in the community; andWHEREAS, Individuals enrolled in PACE receive all Medicare and Medi-Cal covered items and services and additional support, which promotes well-being and greater independence; andWHEREAS, PACE assumes full financial risk for all care and medical services, including transportation, hospitalization, and long-term care, in return for capitated payments from Medicare and Medi-Cal; andWHEREAS, On Lok, Californias first PACE program, opened in 1983. There are now 12 PACE programs operating in 47 sites, serving more than 8,000 participants; andWHEREAS, The California PACE Association, known as CalPACE, formed in 2003 to support the development, expansion, success, and quality of PACE throughout California; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes September 2019 as PACE Month in California; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.
22
3- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131 CHAPTER 177 Relative to the Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly. [ Filed with Secretary of State September 26, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Petrie-Norris. PACE Month.This measure would recognize September 2019 as PACE Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
3+ Enrolled September 13, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 09, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131Introduced by Assembly Member Petrie-NorrisAugust 19, 2019 Relative to the Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 131, Petrie-Norris. PACE Month.This measure would recognize September 2019 as PACE Month in California.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO
44
5- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131 CHAPTER 177
5+ Enrolled September 13, 2019 Passed IN Senate September 09, 2019 Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019
66
7- Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 131
7+Enrolled September 13, 2019
8+Passed IN Senate September 09, 2019
9+Passed IN Assembly August 30, 2019
810
9- CHAPTER 177
11+ CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION
12+
13+ Assembly Concurrent Resolution
14+
15+No. 131
16+
17+Introduced by Assembly Member Petrie-NorrisAugust 19, 2019
18+
19+Introduced by Assembly Member Petrie-Norris
20+August 19, 2019
1021
1122 Relative to the Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly.
12-
13- [ Filed with Secretary of State September 26, 2019. ]
1423
1524 LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1625
1726 ## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST
1827
1928 ACR 131, Petrie-Norris. PACE Month.
2029
2130 This measure would recognize September 2019 as PACE Month in California.
2231
2332 This measure would recognize September 2019 as PACE Month in California.
2433
2534 ## Digest Key
2635
2736 ## Bill Text
2837
2938 WHEREAS, The Program of All-inclusive Care for the Elderly (PACE) addresses the needs of the frail elderly and disabled adults 55 years of age and older, a population that is growing rapidly and whose impact on health care costs is significant; and
3039
3140 WHEREAS, PACE is a fully integrated model of care that provides comprehensive, highly coordinated care allowing frail older adults who meet state eligibility criteria for nursing home level of care to continue living in the community; and
3241
3342 WHEREAS, Individuals enrolled in PACE receive all Medicare and Medi-Cal covered items and services and additional support, which promotes well-being and greater independence; and
3443
3544 WHEREAS, PACE assumes full financial risk for all care and medical services, including transportation, hospitalization, and long-term care, in return for capitated payments from Medicare and Medi-Cal; and
3645
3746 WHEREAS, On Lok, Californias first PACE program, opened in 1983. There are now 12 PACE programs operating in 47 sites, serving more than 8,000 participants; and
3847
3948 WHEREAS, The California PACE Association, known as CalPACE, formed in 2003 to support the development, expansion, success, and quality of PACE throughout California; now, therefore, be it
4049
4150 Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby recognizes September 2019 as PACE Month in California; and be it further
4251
4352 Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.