Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2020.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/14/2020
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2020
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2020
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4378.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2020
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2020
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2020
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2020
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2020
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4601.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2020
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2020
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2020
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2020
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2019
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2019
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|