Assembly | 02/13/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2020 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 3998.). | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2020 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3201.) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2020 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/29/2020 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 01/22/2020 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3788.) | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 9). | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2020 | Introduced. To print. |