Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2020 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3243.) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2020 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3941.) | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 23). | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2020 | Introduced. To print. |