1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 15 CHAPTER 6 Relative to California Fitness Week. [ Filed with Secretary of State February 22, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 15, Chen. California Fitness Week.This measure would proclaim the week of February 3 to February 9, 2019, as California Fitness Week, and would encourage all Californians to enrich their lives through proper nutrition and exercise.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Exercise and fitness activities can increase self-esteem, boost energy, strengthen the heart and muscles, and burn calories; andWHEREAS, Exercise and fitness activities are excellent ways to relieve stress, lower the risk of heart disease and diabetes, prevent bone loss, and decrease the risk of some cancers; andWHEREAS, A persons fitness level has a dramatic effect on the bodys ability to produce energy and to reduce fat; andWHEREAS, There is no age limit for physical activity. Among the elderly, exercise provides cardiovascular, respiratory, neuromuscular, metabolic, and mental health benefits; andWHEREAS, Improving ones physical and mental strength is never a weakness. Fitness activities have been shown to sharpen mental ability in all people, and to slow the aging process; andWHEREAS, Maximizing ones energy level, increasing muscle mass, and reducing body fat increases ones chances of living a longer, healthier life; andWHEREAS, While California ranks 47th among states in adult obesity, its rate is currently 25 percent, up from 18.7 percent in 2000 and from 9.9 percent in 1990; andWHEREAS, The State Department of Education reports that a majority of Californias children are not physically fit; andWHEREAS, A recent survey by the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention identified that 71 percent of high school students in California do not get eight hours or more of sleep each night; andWHEREAS, The federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention also reports that almost two-thirds of all youth in the United States consume at least one sugar sweetened beverage per day; andWHEREAS, It is important to educate youth and adults of the harmful effects of improper nutrition and inactivity. It is equally important to show them how to reverse those negative effects and to live healthier lives; and WHEREAS, The Legislature seeks to advance the physical fitness of all Californians by educating them about the benefits of exercise, rest, and proper nutrition; andResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the week of February 3 to February 9, 2019, as California Fitness Week, and encourages all Californians to enrich their lives through proper nutrition and exercise; and be it furtherResolved, The Legislature will increase public awareness about the benefits of exercise and physical fitness by encouraging its Members to host events in their districts that stimulate physical fitness and increase participation by Californians in activities that promote physical health and benefit both mental and physical well-being; and be it furtherResolved, The Legislature encourages its Members, as well as organizations, businesses, and individuals, to sponsor and attend physical fitness events that are both effective and fun, inspiring Californians to become physically fit and to maintain such fitness; and be it furtherResolved, The Legislature encourages retailers and restaurants to provide healthier and cost-effective choices to consumers; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 20, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 19, 2019 Passed IN Assembly February 04, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 15Introduced by Assembly Members Chen and Gipson(Coauthors: Assembly Members Flora, Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Bonta, Burke, Carrillo, Chau, Chiu, Choi, Chu, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Diep, Eggman, Fong, Frazier, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gloria, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Kalra, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Low, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Ting, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)January 22, 2019 Relative to California Fitness Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 15, Chen. California Fitness Week.This measure would proclaim the week of February 3 to February 9, 2019, as California Fitness Week, and would encourage all Californians to enrich their lives through proper nutrition and exercise.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Exercise and fitness activities can increase self-esteem, boost energy, strengthen the heart and muscles, and burn calories; andWHEREAS, Exercise and fitness activities are excellent ways to relieve stress, lower the risk of heart disease and diabetes, prevent bone loss, and decrease the risk of some cancers; andWHEREAS, A persons fitness level has a dramatic effect on the bodys ability to produce energy and to reduce fat; andWHEREAS, There is no age limit for physical activity. Among the elderly, exercise provides cardiovascular, respiratory, neuromuscular, metabolic, and mental health benefits; andWHEREAS, Improving ones physical and mental strength is never a weakness. Fitness activities have been shown to sharpen mental ability in all people, and to slow the aging process; andWHEREAS, Maximizing ones energy level, increasing muscle mass, and reducing body fat increases ones chances of living a longer, healthier life; andWHEREAS, While California ranks 47th among states in adult obesity, its rate is currently 25 percent, up from 18.7 percent in 2000 and from 9.9 percent in 1990; andWHEREAS, The State Department of Education reports that a majority of Californias children are not physically fit; andWHEREAS, A recent survey by the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention identified that 71 percent of high school students in California do not get eight hours or more of sleep each night; andWHEREAS, The federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention also reports that almost two-thirds of all youth in the United States consume at least one sugar sweetened beverage per day; andWHEREAS, It is important to educate youth and adults of the harmful effects of improper nutrition and inactivity. It is equally important to show them how to reverse those negative effects and to live healthier lives; and WHEREAS, The Legislature seeks to advance the physical fitness of all Californians by educating them about the benefits of exercise, rest, and proper nutrition; andResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby proclaims the week of February 3 to February 9, 2019, as California Fitness Week, and encourages all Californians to enrich their lives through proper nutrition and exercise; and be it furtherResolved, The Legislature will increase public awareness about the benefits of exercise and physical fitness by encouraging its Members to host events in their districts that stimulate physical fitness and increase participation by Californians in activities that promote physical health and benefit both mental and physical well-being; and be it furtherResolved, The Legislature encourages its Members, as well as organizations, businesses, and individuals, to sponsor and attend physical fitness events that are both effective and fun, inspiring Californians to become physically fit and to maintain such fitness; and be it furtherResolved, The Legislature encourages retailers and restaurants to provide healthier and cost-effective choices to consumers; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|