Assembly | 03/04/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3326.) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2020 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3989.) | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2020 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/03/2020 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 30). | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2020 | Introduced. To print. |