1 | | - | Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 16 CHAPTER 7 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. [ Filed with Secretary of State February 22, 2019. ] LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 16, Chiu. Lunar New Year celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, February 5, 2019, marks the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; and WHEREAS, California is home to nearly six million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, IuMien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by over 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, This Lunar New Year is the Year of the Pig and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 5, 2019, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Pig, and extends best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|
| 1 | + | Enrolled February 20, 2019 Passed IN Senate February 19, 2019 Passed IN Assembly February 04, 2019 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20192020 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 16Introduced by Assembly Member Chiu(Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Bonta, Chau, Chen, Choi, Chu, Diep, Fong, Gloria, Kalra, Low, Muratsuchi, Nazarian, and Ting)(Principal coauthors: Senators Chang and Pan)(Coauthors: Assembly Members Aguiar-Curry, Arambula, Bauer-Kahan, Berman, Bigelow, Bloom, Boerner Horvath, Brough, Burke, Carrillo, Cooper, Dahle, Daly, Eggman, Flora, Friedman, Gabriel, Gallagher, Cristina Garcia, Eduardo Garcia, Gipson, Gonzalez, Gray, Grayson, Holden, Irwin, Kamlager-Dove, Kiley, Lackey, Levine, Limn, Maienschein, Mathis, Mayes, McCarty, Medina, Melendez, Mullin, Obernolte, ODonnell, Patterson, Petrie-Norris, Quirk, Quirk-Silva, Ramos, Rendon, Reyes, Luz Rivas, Robert Rivas, Blanca Rubio, Salas, Santiago, Smith, Mark Stone, Voepel, Waldron, Weber, Wicks, and Wood)January 23, 2019 Relative to the Lunar New Year celebration. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 16, Chiu. Lunar New Year celebration. This measure would recognize the Lunar New Year celebration. Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, February 5, 2019, marks the beginning of the Lunar New Year, which is celebrated in many Asian communities around the world, including the United States, and especially California; and WHEREAS, California is home to nearly six million Asian and Pacific Islander Americans of Bangladeshi, Cambodian, Chinese, Filipino, Hmong, Indian, Indonesian, IuMien, Japanese, Korean, Laotian, Malaysian, Pakistani, Sri Lankan, Taiwanese, and Vietnamese descent; andWHEREAS, The Asian and Pacific Islander American community has contributed to the social, cultural, civic, economic, and academic success of the state; andWHEREAS, The Lunar New Year is predominantly celebrated by over 2.5 million Chinese, Korean, and Vietnamese residents of California; andWHEREAS, This Lunar New Year is the Year of the Pig and is universally celebrated by these communities as a time to renew family ties and start the new year with a clean slate; andWHEREAS, The celebration of the Lunar New Year in communities throughout California illustrates the states rich cultural history and commitment to racial, religious, and cultural diversity; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Asian and Pacific Islander communities throughout the state in celebrating February 5, 2019, as the beginning of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Pig, and extends best wishes for a peaceful and prosperous Lunar New Year to all Californians; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution. |
---|