Assembly | 03/18/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2020 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3384.) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2020 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4198.) | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 24). | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2020 | Introduced. To print. |