Assembly | 06/25/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 27, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2020 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3749.) | ||
Senate | 06/16/2020 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/16/2020 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4257.) | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (February 27). | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2020 | Introduced. To print. |