Assembly | 09/14/2020 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2020. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2020 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2020 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2020 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4380.) | ||
Senate | 08/20/2020 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2020 | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2020 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2020 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2020 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2020 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4723.) | ||
Assembly | 06/02/2020 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2020 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2020 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2020 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2020 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2020 | Introduced. To print. |